Can You Solve These Mental Math Problems?

EDUCATION

133 PLAYS

Becky

5 Min Quiz

Image: PCH

About This Quiz

Were you a mental math athlete, or mathlete, in school? Has it been a while since you flexed your mental math muscles? If you think you've still got what it takes to ace a mental math challenge, take this quiz to find out how much you really remember?

We know that you've probably heard of the national spelling bee, but did you know that there are similar competitions at various levels (city, state, regional, national, etc.) for kids who excel in math? Well, it's true. Just in case you weren't a nerd in school, or you didn't hang out with nerds, there are actual competitions where students go to compete with other math geniuses. OK, so most of them aren't geniuses, but they certainly have mastered some pretty cool ways to perform mathematical equations in their heads. These kids are called "mathletes" these days, and they gather regularly to practice those snazzy mental calculations and to compete against one another before heading off to a regional, or even national, competition.

So, if you were one of those nerds, we've got a quiz to bring back some, hopefully good, memories. Are you up to the task?

Let's find out how much mental math power you still have.

2+2=?

2+2=4. We thought we'd start you off with an easy one.

Advertisement

5x10=?

5x10=50. Multiplying by 10 is easy. Whenever you multiply a number by 10, just add a "0" to the number.

Advertisement

What is 15% of 30?

15% of 30 is 4.5. When figuring 15%, just take 10% (3) and add half of that (1.5).

Advertisement

21x11=?

21x11=231. To multiply a number by 11 in your head, just multiply by 10 (or add a zero to the original number) and add one more of the original number. It looks like this 21, plus a zero is 210. Then add 21. The answer is 231.

Advertisement

5x5=?

5x5=25. Basic math tables, folks.

Advertisement

360x5=?

360x5=1800. To multiply a number by 5, just divide it in half, then add a zero.

Advertisement

648+250=?

648+250=898. For this problem change the 648 to 650 to make it easier to do, then subtract 2 from the result.

Advertisement

What is 10% of 235?

10% of 235 is 23.5. To find 10% of a number, just move the decimal point to the left one place.

Advertisement

200x100=?

200x100=20000. To multiply two numbers with 0s, just multiply the numbers, then add all the 0s. It looks like this 2x1=2, then add four 0s. The answer is 20000.

Advertisement

1000-689=?

1000-689=311. To subtract a large number from 1000, just round the number up to the closest 100, then subtract and add on the remainder. So, think of 100-689 as 1000-700, then add 11.

Advertisement

563x10=?

563x10=5630. To multiply a number by 10, just add a zero.

Advertisement

250x20=?

250x20=5000. To multiply a number by 20, just double the number, then add a 0.

Advertisement

1250 ÷ 10=?

1250 ÷ 10= 125. To divide a number that ends in zero by 10, just remove the zero.

Advertisement

3x4=?

3x4=12. We figured you'd welcome an easy one for a change.

Advertisement

22x11=?

22x11=242. To multiply a number by 11, just multiply the number by 10, then add the number.

Advertisement

9x9=?

9x9=81. On the high side of the multiplication table, but you should know this one by heart.

Advertisement

450x5=?

450x5=2250. To multiply a number by 5, just divide the number in half, then add a 0.

Advertisement

4200+500=?

4200+500=4700. To add hundreds, just think of them as hundreds. So, 42 hundreds plus 5 hundreds, is 42+5, which is 47 hundreds, or 4700.

Advertisement

200+300+40=?

200+300+40=540. This of this as 2 hundreds plus 3 hundreds plus 40.

Advertisement

69+18=?

69+18=87. Think of this as 70+18=88, then subtract 1 to get 87.

Advertisement

10x10=?

10x10=100. Break time.

Advertisement

56x100=?

56x100=5600. To multiply any number by 100, just add two 0s to the number.

Advertisement

369 ÷ 10=?

369 ÷ 10=36.9. To divide any number by 10, just move the decimal to the left one place.

Advertisement

240x2=?

240x2=480. To multiply a number by two, just double it, or add it to itself.

Advertisement

70+20+80=?

70+20+80=170. Since we can easily see that 20+80=100, do that part of the problem first, then add 70 to get the answer of 170.

Advertisement

25+38+75=?

25+38+75=138. We can easily see that 25+75=100, so lets rearrange the problem so that it's easier.

Advertisement

396 ÷ 100=?

396 ÷ 100=3.96. To divide any number by 100, just move the decimal to the left two places.

Advertisement

15-7=?

15-7=8. It's easier to think of this as an addition problem. What do you need to add to 7 to reach 15?

Advertisement

53+56=?

53+56=109. Think of this as 50+50+3+6=109.

Advertisement

7x300=?

7x300=2100. Just multiply 7x3, then add two 0s.

Advertisement

6x49=?

6x49=294. Think of this as 6x50=300-6=294.

Advertisement

8x15=?

8x15=120. Some numbers are easier to multiply in your head if you change them. For this one, cut one in half, then double the other to make it easier to manage. Half of 8 is 4, and double 15 is 30, so 4x30=120.

Advertisement

56 ÷ 8=?

56 ÷ 8=7. Think of this as multiplication instead. What times 8 equals 56?

Advertisement

56 ÷ 100=?

56 ÷ 100=.56. To divide by 100, just move the decimal to the left two places. In this case, that makes the answer less than one.

Advertisement

5+5=?

5+5=10. Easy peasy, to end the quiz. We figured your brain might be tired.

Advertisement

About HowStuffWorks Play

How much do you know about dinosaurs? What is an octane rating? And how do you use a proper noun? Lucky for you, HowStuffWorks Play is here to help. Our award-winning website offers reliable, easy-to-understand explanations about how the world works. From fun quizzes that bring joy to your day, to compelling photography and fascinating lists, HowStuffWorks Play offers something for everyone. Sometimes we explain how stuff works, other times, we ask you, but we’re always exploring in the name of fun! Because learning is fun, so stick with us!

Explore More Quizzes